CA AB203 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4212, 4213, 4220, and 4222 of the Public Resources Code, relating to forestry and fire prevention.
Title
State responsibility areas: fire prevention fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] |
Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Obernolte. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |