CA AB2027 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 749, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 749, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 679.11 to the Penal Code, relating to victims of crime.
Title
Victims of crime: nonimmigrant status.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2027 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2027 Quirk By De Le (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2027 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2027 Quirk By De Le (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2027 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 749, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 6190.). |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5121.). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5082.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 679.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |