CA AB2026 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 11704.6 and 11801 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicle sales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Used vehicle salespersons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2026 LACKEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2026 Lackey By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2026 LACKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-08-28AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-23AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6495.).
2018-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5449.).
2018-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-06SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5213.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2018-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code11704.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code11801New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback