CA AB2026 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-29 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 26. Noes 34. Page 5354.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-29 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 26. Noes 34. Page 5354.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 798.74 of the Civil Code, relating to mobilehome parks.
Title
Mobilehome parks: sales.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2026 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 26. Noes 34. Page 5354.). |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5096.) |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 30). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 798.73.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 798.74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |