CA AB202 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 2089.26 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to endangered species.
Title
Endangered species: conservation: California State Safe Harbor Agreement Program Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - AB 202 Mathis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 814.) |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2089.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |