CA AB2019 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6270.7 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 32139 of, and to add Sections 32132.96 and 32140 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care districts.
Title
Health care districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2019 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2019 Aguiar-Curry By McGuire (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2019 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2019 Aguiar-Curry By McGuire (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2019 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6495.). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5455.). |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5162.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6270.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 32121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 32132.96 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 32139 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 32140 | New Code | See Bill Text |