CA AB2012 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 994, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 44977.5, 45196.1, 87780.1, and 88196.1 of the Education Code, relating to school and community college employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School and community college employees: parental leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2012 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2012 Medina et al. By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2012 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 994, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 23. Page 6835.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5792.).
2018-08-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-22SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-06-25SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 5209.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 9).
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-16AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
2018-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2018-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44977.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code45196.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code87780.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88196.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback