CA AB1995 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14005.26, 14005.27, 14007.9, 14134, 15811, 15826, 15832, and 15848.5 of, to add Section 15854.5 to, and to repeal Section 15835 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: premiums, contributions, and copayments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1995 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1995 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14007.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15826 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15832 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15835 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15848.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15854.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |