CA AB1993 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 21636 of, and to add Section 21636.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to secondhand goods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secondhand goods: tangible personal property: dealers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1993 Gipson By Hill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1993 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-24 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-13AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5161.).
2018-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 4890.)
2018-04-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2018-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code21636Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code21636.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback