CA AB1991 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 2.4 (commencing with Section 1954.08) of Title 5 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Motels and hotels: publicly funded shelter programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1991 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1991 Gabriel By Kamlager (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1991 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1991 Gabriel By Kamlager (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1991 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5061.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4919.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1954.08 | New Code | See Bill Text |