CA AB199 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26003 and 26011.8 of the Public Resources Code, relating to alternative energy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Alternative energy: recycled feedstock.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. David Hadley [R] | Asm. Matthew Harper [R] |
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 199 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB199 Eggman Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - AB 199 EGGMAN Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB199 Eggman Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - AB 199 EGGMAN Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3194.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3194.). |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2756.). |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 1. Page 2678.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 10). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2645.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.) Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2621.). |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). Received July 17, 2015 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(10). Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2470.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 2470.) (pending re-referral to Com. on APPR.) |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Retained in suspense file. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26011.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |