CA AB1989 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 7.5 (commencing with Section 111822) to Part 5 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to menstrual products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Menstrual Products Right to Know Act of 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1989 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1989 Cristina Garcia By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1989 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-08-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1).
2020-07-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.)
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-18AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 14).
2020-03-16AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2020-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-27AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M.
2020-01-28AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
2020-01-27AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code111822New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback