CA AB1987 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6320 of the Family Code, relating to protective orders.
Title
Protective orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. |
2020-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |