CA AB1984 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 216 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 14502 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 14672.5, 25351.3, 25560.4, 26625.3, 26625.6, 26625.9, 26639.2, 69504, 72116, 74820.1, 76000, 76223, 77201.3, and 77655 of, to amend the heading of Article 1.2 (commencing with Section 26625) of Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 2 of Title 3 of, to amend the heading of Article 32.3 (commencing with Section 74820) of Chapter 10 of Title 8 of, to amend and repeal Section 70624 of, to repeal Sections 6520, 24261, 26625, 26625.5, 26625.8, 26639, 26639.3, 68073.5, 70394, 71002, 71383, 73750, 73756, 73956, 76225, 77650, 77651, 77652, 77653, and 77654 of, to repeal Article 1.75 (commencing with Section 26638.15) of Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 2 of Title 3 of, to repeal Article 1 (commencing with Section 73301), Article 3 (commencing with Section 73390), Article 7 (commencing with Section 73560), Article 9.5 (commencing with Section 73660), Article 10.5 (commencing with Section 73698), Article 11.5 (commencing with Section 73730), Article 12 (commencing with Section 73770), Article 12.2 (commencing with Section 73783.1), Article 12.3 (commencing with Section 73784), Article 12.5 (commencing with Section 73790), Article 27 (commencing with Section 74602), Article 28 (commencing with Section 74640), Article 29.6 (commencing with Section 74720), Article 30.1 (commencing with Section 74760), Article 35.5 (commencing with Section 74915), Article 37 (commencing with Section 74934), Article 38 (commencing with Section 74948), Article 39 (commencing with Section 74960) of Chapter 10 of Title 8 of, and Article 1 (commencing with Section 77600) of Chapter 14 of Title 8 of, and to repeal and add the heading of Article 1.8 (commencing with Section 26639) of Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 2 of Title 3 of, and the heading of Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 73301) of Title 8 of, the Government Code, and to repeal Section 25254 of the Vehicle Code, relating to courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 1984 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-03-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-02-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-01-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
2020-01-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure216Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code14502Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14672.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code25351.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code25560.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code26625.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code26625.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code26625.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code26639New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code26639.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code69504Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code70624Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code72116Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code73301New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code74820.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code76000Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code76223Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code77201.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code77655Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code25254Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback