CA AB1980 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 13082 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to the memorial to California firefighters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorial to California firefighters: modifications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1980 Irwin (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1980 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2016-08-22AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2016-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2016-08-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5011.).
2016-08-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-01SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2016-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
2016-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2016-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2016-05-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2016-05-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
2016-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2016-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2016-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2016-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2016-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2016-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code13082New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code13083Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1980&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_bill_20160216_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_bill_20160317_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_bill_20160328_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_bill_20160511_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_bill_20160817_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_bill_20160927_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_vote_20160406_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_vote_20160518_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_vote_20160527_1038AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1980_vote_20160816_1107AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback