CA AB1980 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 538, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 538, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4800, 4802, 4804.5, 4807, 4809.8, 4839, 4840.7, and 4887 of, to amend and repeal Sections 4832, 4833, 4834, and 4835 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 4810 of, to add Sections 4830.8, 4839.5, and 4841.1 to, and to repeal and add Section 4801 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 8659 of the Government Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Veterinary medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1980 HAYASHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1980 Hayashi By Negrete McLeod (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1980 HAYASHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1980 Hayashi By Negrete McLeod (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1980 HAYASHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 538, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6641.) | |
2010-08-24 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 24). | |
2010-08-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-08-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4485.) | |
2010-08-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-10 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-09 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-04 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-29 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-28 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). | |
2010-06-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-05-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5043.) | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2010-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-04-28 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |