CA AB1979 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 17141.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: gross income exclusion: homeownership savings accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 7).
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-04-17AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-02-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2018-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17141.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17204.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback