CA AB1978 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22651, and to add Section 23109.3 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: speed contests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1978 Sanchez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1978 Sanchez By Wilk (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1978 Sanchez By Wilk (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1978 Vince Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1978 Sanchez By Wilk (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1978 Sanchez By Wilk (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1978 Vince Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2024-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5292.). |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB S. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5348.) |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23109.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |