CA AB1976 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 940, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1031 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment: lactation accommodation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1976 LIMÓN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1976 Limón et al. By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - AB 1976 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 940, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6993.).
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5967.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 13).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-04-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 1. Page 4561.)
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-04-04AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2018-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1031Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback