CA AB1974 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49014 to the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: collection of debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1974 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1974 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1974 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1974 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1974 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 6848.). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 5760.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 5397.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 21). |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49014 | New Code | See Bill Text |