CA AB1970 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 18998.15 and 18998.35 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental Health: Black Mental Health Navigator Certification.
Sponsors
Asm. Corey Jackson [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1970 Jackson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1970 Jackson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 1.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18998.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18998.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |