CA AB1970 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66014.1 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: pilot program for free tuition and fees: working group.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66014.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1970 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1970 |