CA AB1969 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.9 (commencing with Section 66029) to Chapter 2 of Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: intersegmental coordination in governance.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - AB 1969 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1969 Levine (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1969 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1969 Levine (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1969 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6038.). |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4378.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5363.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66029 | New Code | See Bill Text |