CA AB1965 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 809, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 809, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.98 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1965 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1965 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1965 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1965 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1965 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1965 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1965 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1965 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1965 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 809, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6081.). |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6006.) |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 0. Page 6006.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5436.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19867 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.98 | New Code | See Bill Text |