CA AB1964 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66027.2 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
California State University and California Community Colleges: course articulation: ethnic studies.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Fong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66027.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |