CA AB1964 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 18898) to, and to add the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 18897) to, Part 2.4 of Division 13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organized camps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-31AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
2018-01-30AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code18897Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code18897.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code18898New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback