CA AB1960 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 301 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1960 Villapudua (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Assembly - AB 1960 Villapudua Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Assembly - AB 1960 Villapudua Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-06-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4129.). |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 31). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4215.) |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 30). |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |