CA AB1960 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Coauthors revised.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Coauthors revised.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to tribal gaming, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Indian Gaming Special Distribution Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1960 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1960 |