CA AB1959 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 15210) to Part 6 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to add and repeal Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 12555) of Chapter 6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Innocence Commission Pilot Programs: Post-Conviction Justice Unit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2024-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2024-03-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-03-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-03-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2024-03-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-02-29AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2024-02-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-02-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2024-02-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-01-30AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 29.
2024-01-29AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12555Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code15210New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback