CA AB1959 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 256, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 275.6 and 276.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: universal service programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1959 Wood et al. By Fuller Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1959 WOOD Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 256, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-05 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 5457.).
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5396.).
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on C. & C.
2018-01-31AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
2018-01-30AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code275.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code276.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback