CA AB1957 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11023.7 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Social services: communications: computer-generated text messages.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1957 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1957 Berman By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1957 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1957 Berman By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1957 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6606.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5555.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5395.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and P. & C.P. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11023.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11023.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11023.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |