CA AB1954 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 358.1, 361.3, 361.45, 16002, 16004, and 16519.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care: relative and sibling placement.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2020-01-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16519.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 358.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1954 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1954 |