CA AB1953 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8332 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 148.6, 832.18, 13010.5, 13012, and 13012.5 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 41603 of the Vehicle Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Peace officers: civilian complaints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1953 Weber (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - AB 1953 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - AB 1953 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4263.) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8332 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13010.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13012.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 148.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 832.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 41603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |