CA AB1952 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 10001.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to food access.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social services: access to food.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1952 MAYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-07-02SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and AGRI.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5394.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGRI.
2018-01-30AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10001.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback