CA AB1948 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2574, 42238.01, 42238.02, 42238.05, 42238.051, and 42280 of, to amend and repeal Section 42238.052 of, and to add Section 42238.023 to, the Education Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: local control funding formula: low-income pupils: pupils experiencing homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1948 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5007.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 2574 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42238.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42238.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42238.023 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 42238.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42238.051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42238.052 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |