CA AB1947 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 98.7 and 1102.5 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment violation complaints: requirements: time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 1947 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 23.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-01-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
2020-01-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
2020-01-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1102.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code98.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback