CA AB1946 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-30 - Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
Pending: Assembly Aging And Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-30 - Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
Pending: Assembly Aging And Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1001.35, 1001.36, 1370, and 1370.01 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 4361 and 8103 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Public safety: mentally disordered individuals: diversion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1001.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1370.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 368 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4361 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1946 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1946 |