CA AB1944 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 54953 of the Government Code, relating to public meetings.
Title
Local government: open and public meetings.
Sponsors
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] |
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1944 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 12.) |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4908.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 4). |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54953 | Amended Code | Citation Text |