CA AB1943 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 50480) of Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing: the Tiny Homes of California Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50480 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |