CA AB1942 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to forestry and fire protection, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Forestry and fire protection: reduction of emissions of greenhouse gases.
Sponsors
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Asm. Jay Obernolte [R] |
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1942 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1942 |