CA AB1942 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19852 and 19853 of, and to add Section 18573 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to tax administration.
Title
California Earned Income Tax Credit: Earned Income Tax Credit Information Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18573 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19852 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |