CA AB1941 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12201.07 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
State Supplementary Program for the Aged, Blind, and Disabled: supplemental aid.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. Lisa Calderon [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12201.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |