CA AB1938 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 903, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 903, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 56040.6 to the Education Code, relating to special education.
Title
Special education: inclusion and universal design for learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1938 Gallagher Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1938 Gallagher et al. By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1938 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1938 Gallagher et al. By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1938 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 903, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56040.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |