CA AB1937 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 45060 and 87833 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 1150, 1152, 1153, 1157.3, 71638, and 71824 of, and to repeal Section 1157.10 of, the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public employment: payroll deductions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1937 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1937 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5463.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2018-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87833 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1157.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1157.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3508.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 71638 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 71824 | Amended Code | Citation Text |