CA AB1932 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26185 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: licenses to carry concealed firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-06AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-25AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
2018-01-24AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code26185Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback