CA AB1932 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11223 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: motorcycle safety training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1932 OBERNOLTE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1932 Obernolte By Morrell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1932 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1932 Obernolte By Morrell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1932 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6032.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4972.). |
2016-08-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4684.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11223 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 2932 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 42005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 42005.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |