CA AB1930 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-01 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66205.4 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: University of California and California State University: student eligibility policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 1930 Medina Third Reading Urgency (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 29).
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-11AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1.).
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-18AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 13).
2020-04-06AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-01-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2020-01-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
2020-01-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66205.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback