CA AB1930 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 7911.1 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 1502.45, 1505, 1507.25, 1517, 1517.1, 1517.5, 1522, 1524, 1527, 1527.1, 1527.2, 1527.4, 1527.5, 1534, 1551.3, 1558, and 1558.1 of, and to add Sections 1524.01 and 1551.15 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 212.5, 316.1, 361.2, 361.4, 4094.2, 4096.1, 4096.55, 11363, 11386, 11402.01, 11461, 11462, 11462.001, 11462.01, 11462.011, 11462.015, 11462.021, 11463, 11466.01, 16120, 16500.5, 16504.5, 16519.5, 16519.58, 16519.6, 16601, 16604, 18360, and 18360.10 of, and to add Sections 362.06, 16501.02, 16519.501, and 16519.555 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1930 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5213.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-06AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-01-25AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
2018-01-24AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code7911.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1502.45Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1505Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1507.25Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1517Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1517.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1517.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1522Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1524Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1524.01New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1527Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1527.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1527.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1527.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1527.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1534Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1551.15New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1551.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1558Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1558.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11363Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11386Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11402.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11461Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11462Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11462.001Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11462.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11462.011Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11462.015Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11462.021Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11463Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11466.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16120Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16500.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16501.02New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16504.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16519.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16519.501New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16519.555New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16519.58Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16519.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16601Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16604Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18360Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18360.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code212.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code316.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code361.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code361.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code362.06New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4094.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4096.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4096.55Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback