CA AB1928 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 14318 of the Public Resources Code, relating to resources conservation.
Title
California Conservation Corps: contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1928 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1928 McCarty et al. By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1928 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1928 McCarty et al. By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1928 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6494.). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5455.). |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5393.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14318 | New Code | See Bill Text |