CA AB1924 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 638.52 and 1546.1 of, and to add Sections 638.54 and 638.55 to, the Penal Code, relating to privacy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Privacy: electronic communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1924 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1924 Low By Leno Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1924 LOW Third Reading Urgency (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1924 Low By Leno Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1924 LOW Third Reading Urgency (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6437.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5309.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4953.). |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4887.) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1546.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 638.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 638.54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 638.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |